THE KEZI SILVERSTONE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Campaigns to prevent child abuse and raises funds to support projects that help children fight their past. Help rehabilitate children who are survivors of sexual abuse/exploitation, physical abuse, neglect, domestic violence and mental cruelty. Protect and lend support to children who live with parents who have alcohol / drug addictions or mental health issues. Provide support for child carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN STEVENSON | Chair | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HORTON | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.80k | £1.30k | £3.72k | £864 | £347 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.30k | £4.26k | £455 | £747 | £994 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 May 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO MAKE GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS THAT, PROMOTE THE CARE, SAFETY AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE STUDIO
Pen y Bryn
Tydcombe Road
WARLINGHAM
CR6 9LU
- Phone:
- 01883626859
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window