PEOPLE FOR THE RESPECT AND CARE OF ANIMALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trust is formed with a main object of treating and taking care of stray animals/ birds in India. A few activities of the Trust are broadly described as (1) To make arrangement for the treatment of sick animals, (2) Construction of animal shelters for care and treatment of animals, (3) To vaccinate animals to prevent infectious disease by vaccination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 February 2015: CIO registration
- PRCA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VISHAKHA DOSHI | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. 2. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN INDIA WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM POVERTY OR HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH HELPING THEM ESTABLISH SMALL BUSINESSES.’
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Heath Cut Lodge
North End Way
London
NW3 7HQ
- Phone:
- 02082091404
- Email:
- chhaya.prca@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window