Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NOOK LANE

Charity number: 1157209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 August 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 18 July 2022 14 July 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 18 July 2021 26 May 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 July 2020 12 July 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 July 2019 18 February 2021 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2019 Not Required