ROSEMARY ALMSHOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of almshouses to people of Stanway, Colchester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 10 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Frank Wotton | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Linton Kent | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CAROL SPICE | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Warnes | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|||||
DANIEL JORDAN | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony Colin Bushell | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.90k | £113.51k | £27.15k | £29.17k | £29.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.12k | £79.17k | £11.21k | £15.41k | £20.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £91.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 10 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2018 AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2018 AMENDED ON 20 AUG 2019 as amended on 29 Nov 2022 as amended on 01 Mar 2024 as amended on 25 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROVISION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING (BY WAY OF ALMSHOUSES) AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO ARE OVER 60 YEARS OF AGE AND (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES) TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES) WERE BORN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR ARE RESIDENT THERE AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO WIDOWS, SPINSTERS AND MARRIED COUPLES AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
286 Mersea Road
COLCHESTER
CO2 8QY
- Phone:
- 07990501921
- Email:
- avalonbsl@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window