BRITISH WILDLIFE REHABILITATION COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice, education and information to Wildlife Rehabilitators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 July 2014: CIO registration
- 15 June 2016: Funds received from 1073757 BRITISH WILDLIFE REHABILITATION COUNCIL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dan Forman | Chair | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Onyejekwe | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Morgane Ristic | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Reynolds | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Palmer | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Edwards | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Schwar | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
LUCY BEARMAN-BROWN | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Peto | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY JANE VARGA-SMITH MRCVS | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ALLEN | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91k | £3.90k | £1.08k | £2.92k | £4.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62k | £416 | £3.89k | £1.62k | £4.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF THE CARE AND WELFARE OF SICK, INJURED AND ABANDONED WILD ANIMALS. TO ADVANCE ANIMAL WELFARE BY RESEARCH INTO INTO AND DEVELOPMENT OF TECHNIQUES AND RESOURCES RELATED TO THE PRACTICE OF WILDLIFE RESCUE REHABILITATION, RELEASE AND POST RELEASE MONITORING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 8686
Grantham
NG31 0AG
- Phone:
- 07940 714830
- Email:
- admin@bwrc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window