THE FELLSIDE TRUST

Charity Number: 1158068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Fellside Trust has the purpose of providing opportunities for education in healthcare and the arts to the general public and the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN ASHLEY REYNOLDS Trustee 31 July 2014
None on record
VIDA ELAINE HEDLEY Trustee 31 July 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.02k £3.13k £1.89k £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.97k £3.01k £2.13k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 March 2025 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 31 July 2024 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 March 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FELLSIDE COTTAGE
LOW FELLSIDE
KENDAL
LA9 4NH
Phone:
01539733045
Website:

fellside.org