Financial history SPITAL TONGUES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1158929
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.64k £673 £3.76k £4.23k £8.17k
Total expenditure £4.20k £2.30k £2.51k £3.49k £11.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A