Financial history CHILDREN HEARD AND SEEN

Charity number: 1157879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £134.60k £198.76k £371.27k £574.52k £651.30k
Total expenditure £162.68k £191.62k £262.92k £361.03k £546.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £242.22k £642.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £8.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £332.31k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £346.16k £546.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £14.87k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0