Financial history FRIENDS OF GRIMSBURY FARM

Charity number: 1157979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £310 £5 £2 £53 £157
Total expenditure £6.40k £2.01k £2.69k £2.30k £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A