FRIENDS OF GRIMSBURY FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE FRIENDS OF GRIMSBURY FARM WORK TO PRESERVE, TRANSFORM AND SUSTAIN THE DEVELOPMENT OF GRIMSBURY FARM AND TO CONNECT PEOPLE TO NATURE AND EACH OTHER BY PROVIDING ACTIVITIES FOR THE ENJOYMENT OF GREEN SPACES. WE WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH LOCAL GROUPS TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION ENABLING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION AND DEVELOPMENT, THEREBY IMPROVING THE LIVES OF THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN DAVIES | Chair | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVID HAMBLIN | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH HAMBLIN | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310 | £5 | £2 | £53 | £157 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.40k | £2.01k | £2.69k | £2.30k | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WHERE THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS ARE MET: A) THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED; AND B) THOSE PERSONS HAVE NEED OF THE FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; OR C) THE FACILITIES ARE TO BE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR TO MALE OR FEMALE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRIMSBURY FARM
GRIMSBURY ROAD
BRISTOL
BS15 9SE
- Phone:
- 01179601956
- Email:
- chairman@fogf.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window