Financial history HEART OF BIRMINGHAM VOCATIONAL COLLEGE LTD

Charity number: 1157785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.74m £2.45m £2.71m £3.26m £3.66m
Total expenditure £1.74m £2.20m £2.97m £3.42m £3.52m
Income from government contracts £1.70m £2.26m £2.66m £3.17m £3.56m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £48.62k £28.26k £44.40k £54.89k £36.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.70m £2.26m £2.66m £3.20m £3.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £165.12k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.74m £2.20m £2.97m £3.42m £3.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £2.22k £0 £2.57k