REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - RCCG HOUSE OF MERCY, AYLESBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our principal object is the advancement of Christian faith in accordance with the statement of faith appearing in the schedule hereto in Buckinghamshire and such other part of United Kingdom or the world as the charity trustees may from time to time think fit. Reach out to community with the love of God, provide music as a tool for spiritual therapy for the downcast and hopeless.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 15 September 2014: CIO registration
- 23 June 2015: Funds received from 1124373 RCCG HOUSE OF MERCY
- RCCG HOUSE OF MERCY, AYLESBURY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENJAMEN EKUNDAYO | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Afolabi Fajuyitan | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shodolu Abayomi Coker | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID ESSIEN AKPABIO | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.17k | £212.95k | £235.94k | £293.27k | £348.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.84k | £230.75k | £238.15k | £290.51k | £338.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Santa Cruz Avenue
Newton Leys
Milton Keynes
Milton Keynes
Buckinghamshire
MK3 5HE
- Phone:
- 07506680717
- Email:
- pastor@rccghouseofmercy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window