Trustees SLOW - SUPPORTING BEREAVED PARENTS AND SIBLINGS

Charity number: 1161337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robin Willard Trustee 17 September 2024
SLOW - SUPPORTING BEREAVED PARENTS AND SIBLINGS CIO
Recently registered
Sebastian Michael Lewis Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Lizette Nolte Trustee 13 June 2023
SLOW - SUPPORTING BEREAVED PARENTS AND SIBLINGS CIO
Recently registered
Cicilia Hoi-See Wan Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Paresh Ramesh Pithiya Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Elise Marie Soucie Trustee 01 December 2021
SLOW - SUPPORTING BEREAVED PARENTS AND SIBLINGS CIO
Recently registered
Philippa Grace Murray Trustee 10 September 2012
SLOW - SUPPORTING BEREAVED PARENTS AND SIBLINGS CIO
Recently registered
Tim Robert Whitworth Trustee 28 February 2011
None on record