Accounts and annual returns THE SANCTUARY PROJECT

Charity Number: 1157232
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2018 07 February 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 07 February 2019 3 days late
Annual return 04 April 2017 07 February 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 07 February 2018 3 days late
Annual return 04 April 2016 29 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 29 January 2017 On Time