BRIGHT FUTURES NE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bright Futures deliver a range of project activities to young women aged 11-25 to increase their health, wellbeing and safety. We deliver projects around a range of issues including alcohol misuse, sexual health, domestic abuse, young mums, unemployment and exploitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 25 June 2014: CIO registration
- 13 January 2016: Funds received from 1148945 BRIGHT FUTURES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joyce Welsh | Chair | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Jeromson | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Briscoe | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hartley | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Erin Price | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Moore | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Miekle | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.03k | £438.38k | £353.73k | £407.73k | £312.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.65k | £275.58k | £368.61k | £427.99k | £454.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, EDUCATION, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG WOMEN AGED BETWEEN 11 AND 25 YEARS IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND. THE ORGANISATION WILL ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG WOMEN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 TO 25 LIVING IN SOUTH TYNESIDE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ADDRESS ISSUES CONCERNED WITH ALCOHOL AND SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND SEXUAL HEALTH AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bright Futures
459 John Williamson Street
SOUTH SHIELDS
NE33 5HP
- Phone:
- 0191 455 1196
- Email:
- brightfutures@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window