Financial history BONGABI CIG UK

Charity number: 1158934
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023
Total gross income £9.80k £850 £9.48k £1.50k £2.36k
Total expenditure £9.55k £948 £6.47k £1.40k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A