FRIENDS OF LEDBURY PARISH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds by donations and running of bookstall to help with the maintenance, beautification and preservation of Ledbury Parish Church, its building ornaments and furnishings. Providing Stewards to welcome visitors to Ledbury Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 19 January 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Keyes | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Houghton | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Valerie Anne Houghton | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian James | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY SILCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £5.05k | £7.09k | £10.16k | £9.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.30k | £7.10k | £751 | £3.76k | £1.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1963 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 1975 AND 10 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE RECTOR AND PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF LEDBURY PARISH CHURCH FOR THE PRESERVATION AND ADORNMENT OF LEDBURY PARISH CHURCH AND ITS PRECINCTS AND THE GENERAL MAINTENANCE OF ITS BUILDINGS ORNAMENTS AND FURNISHINGS. TO PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE CHURCH AND ITS HISTORY AND TO SEEK TO JOIN TOGETHER IN A COMMON FELLOWSHIP ALL THOSE WHO LOVE THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LEDBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 BROWNING ROAD
LEDBURY
HR8 2GA
- Phone:
- 01531637376
- Email:
- iandj390@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window