HOME OF LIFE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing healthcare to people in sub-Saharan Africa particularly in Ghana with people suffering from chronic malnutrition , hard to heal wounds , leg ulcers and complex cases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Ghana
Governance
- 18 June 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND OFORI SCIENTIST | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
FELICIA WALLACE | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/01/2020 | 15/01/2021 | 15/01/2022 | 15/01/2023 | 15/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297 | £100 | £200 | £110 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £256 | £80 | £90 | £50 | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 January 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/06/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESENTATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WITH CHRONIC, NON-HEALING AND INFECTED WOUNDS, LIVING IN GHANA AND OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, PROVIDING TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF THEIR WOUNDS. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ON THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF WOUNDS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
110 Green Street
Enfield
EN3 7JE
- Phone:
- 02084433163
- Email:
- fel3wallace@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window