Friends of Abbeyfield Park

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up to explore the possibility of a community asset transfer of Abbeyfield Park House, Burngreave, Sheffield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,572 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 08 October 2014: CIO registration
- ABBEYFIELD COMMUNITY HERITAGE HUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Francis Feeley | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Cook | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Camp | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Wright | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Egan | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LYN BRANDON | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £55.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Oct 2014 as amended on 08 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF ABBEYFIELD PARK HOUSE SITUATED IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD, A GRADE II* LISTED BUILDING; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRESERVATION AND HISTORY OF ABBEYFIELD PARK HOUSE; AND TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE BURNGREAVE WARD OF SHEFFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FIELDS OF LOCAL HERITAGE AND CULTURE) AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Holtwood Road
SHEFFIELD
S4 7BA
- Phone:
- 01142810474
- Email:
- abbeyfieldpark@gmail.com
- Website:
-
abbeyfieldpark.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window