THE FITZROVIA CHAPEL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of arts facilities and opening of a historic building to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 12 February 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen McKechnie | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr LAURA WATERS | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr David Woodhouse | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Pistella | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samar Zia | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carla Whalen | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.76k | £55.29k | £247.42k | £391.59k | £436.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.71k | £162.51k | £112.03k | £275.04k | £367.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.73k | £8.02k | £37.28k | £6.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: 4.1.1 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC ACCESS TO AND USE OF THE CHAPEL BY, AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF, THE RESIDENTS, COMMUNITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, VISITORS AND THE WIDER PUBLIC IN THE AREA SURROUNDING THE CHAPEL, THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF THE CHAPEL, AND ELSEWHERE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF ALL SUCH PEOPLE; 4.1.2 THE PROMOTION, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF CULTURE, LOCAL HISTORY AND HERITAGE AND THE PERFORMING ARTS OF COMMUNITIES LOCAL TO THE CHAPEL AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; 4.1.3 THE CONSERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF THE CHAPEL; 4.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC, SO FAR AS CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS 4.1.1 - 4.1.3 ABOVE, AS THE TRUSTEE DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fitzrovia Chapel
2 Pearson Square
London
W1T 3BF
- Phone:
- 02034099895
- Email:
- info@fitzroviachapel.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window