THE JENNER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the charity is to preserve the property known as The Chantry at Berkeley in the County of Gloucestershire being the property wherein the late Dr Edward Jenner (1749-1823) lived and died as a permanent memorial to Edward Jenner his life and his work (both in local community affairs and in Immunology) and his memory.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 August 2014: CIO registration
- 26 February 2015: Funds received from 284085 THE JENNER TRUST
- DR JENNER'S HOUSE AND GARDEN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Margaret Budden | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Milne | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fergus Devlin Connolly | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Steel | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Denise Statham | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Baden Wallington | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carl Peter Jenner | Trustee | 21 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.07k | £177.09k | £130.56k | £45.31k | £53.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.95k | £78.93k | £89.64k | £80.18k | £101.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.44k | £16.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS THE CHANTRY AT BERKELEY IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE BEING THE PROPERTY WHEREIN THE LATE DR EDWARD JENNER (1749-1823) ("EDWARD JENNER") LIVED AND DIED: (A) AS A PERMANENT MEMORIAL TO EDWARD JENNER HIS LIFE AND HIS WORK (BOTH IN LOCAL COMMUNITY AFFAIRS AND IN IMMUNOLOGY) AND HIS MEMORY; AND ALSO (B) AS A CENTRE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE STUDY OF IMMUNOLOGY AND INCLUDING THE ERADICATION OF DISEASE BY IMMUNOLOGICAL MEANS; AND (C) FOR CHARITABLE OTHER PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF BERKELEY AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE. (2) THE FURTHER OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT AND ENDOWMENT OF THE CHANTRY OR OTHER SUITABLE PROPERTY FOR THE HOUSING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF A MUSEUM LIBRARY HISTORICAL DOCUMENTS PAPERS OBJECTS AND MEMORABILIA ASSOCIATED WITH THE LIFE OF EDWARD JENNER AND AS A CENTRE FOR THE FURTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS DETAILED IN THIS CLAUSE 3 (OBJECTS) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT; AND (B) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE AND CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER PERSONS OR BODY OF PERSONS IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHANTRY OR SUCH OTHER PROPERTY SO PURCHASED FOR SUCH PURPOSES DETAILED IN THIS CLAUSE 3 (OBJECTS) AND AS A CENTRE FOR EDUCATION WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO IMMUNOLOGY AND ALSO FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF BERKELEY (WITHOUT REFERENCE TO AGE SEX RELIGION OR POLITICAL PERSUASION) AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dr Jenner's House
The Chantry
Church Lane
BERKELEY
GL13 9BN
- Phone:
- 01453810631
- Email:
- info@edwardjenner.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window