Accounts and annual returns AL MURTAZA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158535
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 March 2025 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 March 2025 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 November 2024 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 November 2024 281 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 March 2025 1142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required