THE NORTHSTAR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support regeneration by all or any of the following: the advancement of education, training; the provision of financial or technical assistance to organisations and individuals wishing to develop entrepreneurial and other skills; provide opportunities for others; and such other exclusively charitable purpose as the Trustees may from time to time determine in accordance with the law of charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 August 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANTHONY WILLIAM HENFREY | Chair | 12 May 2014 |
|
|||
ANTONY DAVID ROSS | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|||
MARK I'ANSON | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.53k | £59.84k | £58.37k | £32.78k | £33.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.36k | £232.65k | £27.59k | £120.37k | £26.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE: 1)THE PROMOTION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GENERALLY BUT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND (TO INCLUDE NORTHUMBERLAND, COUNTY DURHAM, TYNE AND WEAR AND THE TEES VALLEY AREAS, WITH THE TEES VALLEY BEING DEFINED AS THE HARTLEPOOL, MIDDLESBROUGH, REDCAR AND CLEVELAND, DARLINGTON AND STOCKTON ON TEES UNITARY AUTHORITY AREAS), OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND/OR RETRAINING; AND B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS WISHING TO: I) DEVELOP ENTREPRENEURIAL AND OTHER SKILLS; II) PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR OTHERS; AND/OR III) PROVIDE HELP TO THOSE IN CASE OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED; AND 2) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5TH FLOOR
MAYBROOK HOUSE
27-35 GRAINGER STREET
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 5JE
- Phone:
- 01912292777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window