ST ANNES HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Religious services on weekdays, Sabbaths, and Holy days; b) Pastoral services; c) Educational facilities; d) Facilities for burial of the dead; e) Facilities for marriages; f) Communal social events as appropriate; g) Facilities offered for private social events; h) Support for those in need, where appropriate, through other charitable bodies i) Interfaith activities j) School visits
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Blackpool
Governance
- 07 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Hecht | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pinkus | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Bryan Lipman | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM BRODY | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.77k | £94.47k | £94.47k | £128.69k | £138.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.47k | £88.50k | £88.50k | £123.65k | £140.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC PRAYER AND RELIGIOUS STUDY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Synagogue
38 Orchard Road
Lytham St. Annes
FY8 1PF
- Phone:
- 01253721831
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window