GRANGE WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grange Welfare Association is a Charity for elders who's principal objective is to provide day care services for the elderly in the West area of Newcastle upon Tyne. It is supported by approximately 1,000 members and is the governing body of the Grange Day Centre and the Grange Welfare Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £6,973 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 17 March 2015: Standard registration
- 13 April 2015: Funds received from 258053 THE GRANGE WELFARE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Isabel Wright | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Cane | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|||||
David Illingworth | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANNE WHITTAKER | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER MARY ANDERSON | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.68k | £40.66k | £23.82k | £11.55k | £35.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.63k | £31.82k | £37.53k | £23.71k | £39.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/01/2015
Charitable objects
1) THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
F R P ADVISORY LLP
1ST FLOOR
34 FALCON COURT
PRESTON FARM INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS18 3TX
- Phone:
- 01642917555
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window