THE MARDEN HOUSE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, EDUCATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES FOR THE MARDEN HOUSE CENTRE AND OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR HIRE OF PART OR ALL OF THE MARDEN HOUSE CENTRE FOR COMMERCIAL ACTIVITIES THAT DO NOT COMPROMISE PURPOSE. TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AT MARDEN HOUSE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 13 January 2015: CIO registration
- 15 March 2019: Funds received from 293514 THE MARDEN HOUSE CENTRE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Spencer | Chair | 01 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Andrew Steven Jones | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Thorn | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Penny Jane Spencer | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Maggie Garratt | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.29k | £24.20k | £44.37k | £78.04k | £57.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.48k | £15.72k | £41.24k | £36.80k | £156.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.37k | £2.67k | £21.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CALNE, WILTSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS;AND (II) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CALNE, WILTSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marden House Centre
New Road
CALNE
Wiltshire
SN11 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01249650441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window