Financial history MEDI TECH TRUST

Charity number: 1157837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £136.35k £433.54k £130.62k £98.86k £400.80k
Total expenditure £240.47k £183.26k £194.29k £199.74k £283.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A