Trustees LOVE'S FARM COMMUNITY CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1157648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sam Booker Trustee 08 November 2024
None on record
Sarita Mal Trustee 08 November 2024
None on record
Emma Louise Wootton Trustee 10 November 2023
None on record
Lara Charlene Davenport-Ray Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
Sian Hatt Trustee 03 February 2021
None on record
Mark Gordon Kipping Trustee 11 October 2019
None on record
Dr Maria Rosa Russo Trustee 28 October 2016
None on record