MEGAN'S WISH LIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising & promote the physical and mental health of children from birth to teenage years, suffering from life changing disabilities and potential life shortening illnesses who reside within the districts of Tonbridge and Malling, Sevenoaks, Tunbridge Wells and Maidstone in the county of Kent, through the provision of financial assistance, support, education and practical advice and assistance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 20 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS FOX | Chair | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FRANCIS ROBERT COOPER | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|||||
LYN HODGES | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ELLEN YUILLE FOX | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME HODGES | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS NIKKI COOPER | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58 | £58 | £58 | £58 | £58 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £1.45k | £879 | £92 | £111 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN FROM BIRTH TO TEENAGE YEARS,SUFFERING FROM LIFE CHANGING DISABILITIES AND POTENTIAL LIFE SHORTENING ILLNESSES WHO RESIDE WITHIN THE DISTRICTS OF TONBRIDGE AND MALLING,SEVENOAKS,TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND MAIDSTONE IN THE COUNTY OF KENT,THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE,SUPPORT,EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Birling Road
Ryarsh
WEST MALLING
Kent
ME19 5LS
- Phone:
- 01622370962
- Email:
- info@meganswishlist.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window