Financial history ERB'S PALSY GROUP

Charity number: 1157720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £50.87k £37.64k £38.19k £49.87k £43.58k
Total expenditure £59.69k £28.14k £51.00k £54.81k £42.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A