ERB'S PALSY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer support and advice to those affected Erb's PAlsy, by means of printed literature, telephone and online advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 July 2014: CIO registration
- 28 February 2017: Funds received from 1036423 ERB'S PALSY GROUP
- EPG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN WENDY HILLYER | Chair | 01 November 1994 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Spurway | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Prichard | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Hawksby | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Hole | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Swift | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE SALLY DEWDNEY | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIR ANNE HEMMING | Trustee | 23 October 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.87k | £37.64k | £38.19k | £49.87k | £43.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.69k | £28.14k | £51.00k | £54.81k | £42.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ERB'S PALSY, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE TO THOSE LIVING WITH ERBS PALSY (AND THEIR FAMILIES) SO AS TO ASSIST THEM TO ACHIEVE THEIR PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, EMOTIONAL AND SOCIAL POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 ANCHORWAY ROAD
COVENTRY
CV3 6JJ
- Phone:
- 02476413293
- Email:
- info@erbspalsygroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window