THE FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE AID IN SICKNESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides life-enhancing grants where funding is not readily available from other sources towards medical items and services. We support adults and children whose liives are impaired by severe health problems and are resident in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 July 2014: Standard registration
- 16 March 2017: Funds received from 211896 THE FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE AID IN SICKNESS TRUST
- FNAIST (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Christopher Gervis Melluish | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Frances Vyvyan | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
VISCOUNTESS FLORA SUSAN HOOD | Trustee | 01 December 2009 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Richardson | Trustee | 05 March 2008 |
|
|||||
THE HONOURABLE LADY KATHARINE ELIZABETH BROOKE | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr KARIN MARGARET ENGLEHART | Trustee | 01 December 2006 |
|
|
||||
FIONA CHARLOTTE HUGHES | Trustee | 06 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JOANNA BROOKSBANK | Trustee | 01 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HENRY PARKER | Trustee | 01 February 2002 |
|
|
||||
Lady Tessa Suzanne Mary Brewer OBE | Trustee | 01 October 1997 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £439.30k | £341.88k | £363.98k | £382.07k | £399.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £440.79k | £486.18k | £432.01k | £402.57k | £418.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OLD AGE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES, PROVIDED THAT PREFERENCE IS GIVEN TO THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE PROFESSIONAL, SECRETARIAL OR ADMINISTRATIVE QUALIFICATIONS OR EXPERIENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY HOUSE
ROOM F35
SOUTH STREET
BROMLEY
LONDON
BR1 1RH
- Phone:
- 02079988817
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window