TRANSFORMING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates in two sections. As part of the national Together Network, Transforming Communities Together is engaged in community development within the Diocese of Lichfield, initially within Walsall, Wolverhampton and Sandwell. It also delivers the national Near Neighbours programme within the Black Country
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £26,596 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Dudley
- Leicestershire
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Telford & Wrekin
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 08 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt Revd Sarah Bullock | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Adam Edwards | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Richard Leigh Hill | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jessamnie Dace | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £342.30k | £273.68k | £181.33k | £79.08k | £26.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.83k | £286.33k | £252.97k | £137.77k | £49.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.99k | £35.14k | £13.25k | £5.35k | £26.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 December 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 December 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 APR 2014 as amended on 05 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHRISTIAN BASED CHARITIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS OR ANY ONE OF THEM, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFRASTRUCTURE PROVISION; AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lichfield Diocesan Board Of Finance
St. Marys House
Lichfield
Staffordshire
Staffordshire
WS13 7LD
- Phone:
- 01543306030
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window