Financial history RELIEF FROM PAIN

Charity number: 1160789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.22k £908 £764 £864 £2.67k
Total expenditure £19.80k £672 £9.89k £8.85k £8.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A