Financial history NEWBURY CANCER CARE

Charity number: 1157796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £327.62k £189.21k £338.32k £178.26k £187.30k
Total expenditure £435.04k £201.67k £193.63k £247.42k £222.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A