Trustees NEWBURY CANCER CARE
Charity number: 1157796

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ian Ormrod | Chair | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Campbell | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Gold | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Hunt | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rashmi Knowles | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mairi Clare Bull | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Allum | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Joanne Allen | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Avril Cole | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Lisa Wright | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.