CHESTER WOMEN'S AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity engages in the following activities: - provision of support to women and children who have experienced domestic abuse, in the form of small grants for crisis needs, and funding for activities - raising awareness of issues surrounding domestic violence - monitoring the provision of services for women who have experienced domestic abuse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2025
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 13 January 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Lewis | Chair | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Walton | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Burtonshaw-Gunn | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lucy Elizabeth Rees | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pat Daniels | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Neame | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | 31/03/2025 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.53k | £50.74k | £9.66k | £10.87k | £14.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.96k | £40.06k | £41.78k | £22.33k | £26.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £40.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2025 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2025 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 1975 AMENEDED 22 JANUARY 1980 AND 20 JANUARY 1981 as amended on 20 Sep 2018 as amended on 17 Oct 2019 as amended on 14 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 The Association’s objects (Objects) are to assist persons who have suffered from violence or maltreatment in their homes and are resident within Cheshire at the time of their request for assistance. 3.2 In furtherance of the Objects the Association may (a) provide support to persons who have experienced domestic abuse including but not limited to (i) provision of financial support; (ii) directing persons to relevant agencies/services where appropriate (b) raise awareness and be an independent voice on issues surrounding domestic abuse; (c) monitor the provision of services to persons who have experienced domestic abuse and promote good practice amongst the agencies delivering services to these persons; (d) obtain, collect and receive money and funds by way of contributions, donations, legacies, grants and any such lawful method and accept and receive gifts of property of any description whether subject to any special trusts or not.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE CHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chester Women's Aid
The Blue Coat Building
Upper Northgate Street
CHESTER
CH1 4EE
- Phone:
- 07759 597432
- Email:
- contact@chesterwomensaid.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window