Earth to Ocean

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Securing volunteers to support the worlds problems. A key project at the moment include developing a free online learning portal for leadership in the charity sector, and in country. We have also created the ability to place volunteers in India and working towards sending our first cohort of people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Botswana
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Ecuador
- Ethiopia
- Guatemala
- India
- Kenya
- Mauritius
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Philippines
- Puerto Rico
- South Africa
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
Governance
- 22 July 2014: CIO registration
- VOLUNTEERING FOR CHANGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SASCHA BENSON-COOPER MPP | Chair | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANAYA WILKINS MA | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Jul 2014 as amended on 11 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: (1) THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING VOLUNTEERING AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT BY INDIVIDUALS; (B) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS TO VOLUNTEER; (C) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING FOR VOLUNTEERS; AND (D) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF POOR, SICK, DISTRESSED, VULNERABLE AND UNDER-EDUCATED PERSONS AND COMMUNITIES, IN INDIA, KENYA, UGANDA AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR THE PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH, TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT, IN INDIA, KENYA, UGANDA AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PLACEMENT OF SKILLED VOLUNTEERS FOR PROJECTS WHICH ADVANCE THESE CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (3) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE, WITH THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (4) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING A YOUTH VOLUNTEER SCHEME IN KENYA AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71
Central St
LONDON
EC1V 8AB
- Phone:
- 07881463405
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window