HEREFORD CIDER MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collect and care for items associated with the history and practice of making and selling cider, including the social history, and with items involved in the use of cider, cider brandy and related crafts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Herefordshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Marshall | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Callum Bulmer | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Turner | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FAIRS | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Thomas | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ROE | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Taplin | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Catriona Ward | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fenella Mary Tyler | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Bisset | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £369.41k | £3.36m | £675.37k | £290.96k | £297.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.69k | £231.48k | £321.51k | £386.04k | £512.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.50k | £69.80k | £219 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £3.26m | £388.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £87.44k | £121.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £10.71k | £165.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £216.88k | £303.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £14.61k | £17.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £71.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 23 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HISTORY OF THE CIDER AND PERRY INDUSTRY AND RELATED AGRICULTURAL, ORCHARDING AND INDUSTRIAL PROCESSES BY MAINTAINING A MUSEUM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEREFORD CIDER MUSEUM
THE CIDER MILLS
21 RYELANDS STREET
HEREFORD
HR4 0LW
- Phone:
- 01432354207
- Email:
- enquiries@cidermuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window