MARK EVISON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mark Evison Foundation?s mission is to promote the personal development of young people 16-25 years through non-academic challenge, providing mentoring and expenses-funding for participants? proposed projects. These must be outside applicants? ?comfort zones?, and created from scratch. Beneficiaries become more confident, independent and resilient, and gain many transferable skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 August 2014: CIO registration
- 25 June 2015: Funds received from 1130281 MARK EVISON FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucien Mulberg | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMY ZAMBON | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Elizabeth Speller | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARRIS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH EVISON | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET EVISON | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN MACAUSLAN | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph Arthur Francis Spence | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.31k | £32.40k | £47.65k | £59.25k | £87.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.80k | £49.08k | £69.83k | £123.62k | £117.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO PROMOTE THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES (AND "PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT" MEANS PROMOTING THE PERSONAL, PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL WELL-BEING OF THE INDIVIDUAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 COURT LANE
LONDON
SE21 7EA
- Phone:
- 02086932254
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window