USK AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 504863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Recreation and Personal Development of young people Promotion of agriculture and rural affairs to young people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £18,398
Total expenditure: £21,295

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dominic Hampson - Smith Chair 25 August 2021
None on record
Hannah Starmore Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rhiannon Williams Trustee 19 August 2020
GWENT YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Received: On time
Tim Williams Trustee 19 August 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £12.10k £19.08k £1.82k £19.67k £18.40k
Total expenditure £12.16k £18.05k £2.67k £15.28k £21.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £250

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 05 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Gwent YFC County Office
Usk Campus
The Rhadyr
USK
Gwent
NP15 1XJ
Phone:
07724057553