ACCESS CORBY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Voluntary Sector consortium working together to support the Communities in Corby
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £19,460 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 18 May 2015: Standard registration
- 31 January 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.75k | £13.58k | £4.19k | £4.30k | £23.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.06k | £3.37k | £15.59k | £5.41k | £15.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £19.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF CORBY AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY: I.LIAISING BETWEEN CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENT AGENCIES AND OTHER GROUPS ON RELEVANT ISSUES; II.PROVIDING TRAINING, CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS ON SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THEIR EFFICIENCY; III.IDENTIFYING THEIR NEEDS AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THEM; IV.ASSISTING IN THE ADMINISTRATION OF FUNDING PROGRAMMES TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, MONITORING FOR GRANTS, RECOMM ENDING GRANTS, ASSISTING IN APPLICATIONS FOR GRANTS; V.PROVIDING INFORMATION TO THE PRESS AND THE PUBLIC ON THE OPERATION OF, OR PROBLEMS ENCOUNTERED BY THEM; VI.PROVIDING SERVICES TO THEM SUCH AS LEGAL, ACCOUNTANCY AND MANAGEMENT ADVICE SERVICES; VII.PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON FUND-RAISING TECHNIQUES APPROPRIATE FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES; VIII. ACTING AS A REPRESENTATIVE IN RELATION TO GOVERNMENT POLICIES AND LEGISLATION. ‘THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. ·CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. ·VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION.VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
IN THE AREA OF CORBY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window