Financial history PENTECOSTAL CITY MISSION CHURCH

Charity Number: 1159535
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £255.60k £579.39k £286.74k £348.64k £322.87k
Total expenditure £178.46k £108.46k £186.96k £331.04k £359.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £567.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £12.15k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £290.80k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £108.46k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A