SAWSTON YOUTH DRAMA LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to advance education in all aspects of the performing arts by the provision of workshops and artistic performances. to help young people through the provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare. support and activities which develop their skills and capabilities to enable them to be mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 November 2014: Standard registration
- SYD (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH FURBANK | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANTHONY LONG | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN KEITH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY DAWN FURBANK | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARETH WYNN BONNER | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MEGHAN JANE BONNER | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADAM JOHN BONNER | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.54k | £1.64k | £15.24k | £25.72k | £26.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.57k | £3.36k | £15.03k | £22.73k | £25.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/11/2014
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE PERFORMING ARTS BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN ARTISTIC PERFORMANCES. 2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH:(A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;(B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 WAKELIN AVENUE
SAWSTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 3DS
- Phone:
- 07764344765
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window