CHESHIRE ADVOCACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants to other organisations to provide advocacy services to people with a learning disability living in Cheshire: * assisting clients to obtain their full rights as a citizen * helping clients understand information, communicate and participate in decisions affecting their lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 30 December 2014: CIO registration
- 07 April 2016: Funds received from 1014487 EAST CHESHIRE ADVOCACY
- ECA (Working name)
- EAST CHESHIRE ADVOCACY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE ANN ALEXANDER | Chair | 30 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Readshaw | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Thomas Godden | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES BENSON | Trustee | 30 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Smith | Trustee | 30 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN FRY | Trustee | 30 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £29.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.36k | £7.46k | £17.72k | £12.39k | £9.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADVOCACY SERVICES TO PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE CLIENT(S)) LIVING IN CHESHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheshire Advocacy
C/O Bennett Brooks Accountants
St George's Court
Winnington Avenue
Northwich
CW8 4EE
- Phone:
- 01606721300
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window