Financial history EMPOWERING VULNERABLE CHILDREN ( EVC ) UGANDA

Charity Number: 1158189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £127.37k £99.10k £133.68k £167.06k £215.89k
Total expenditure £78.89k £142.39k £121.99k £206.35k £169.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A