Financial history BEAT THE COLD

Charity number: 1159027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £266.68k £382.83k £660.68k £704.32k £866.85k
Total expenditure £159.50k £271.36k £660.68k £741.42k £798.69k
Income from government contracts £86.60k N/A £192.15k £182.66k £209.76k
Income from government grants N/A £200.70k £112.80k £450.39k £400.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £3.58k £6.50k £20.25k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £112.80k £696.20k £841.96k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £19 £1.62k £4.64k
Income - Other N/A N/A £544.28k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £660.68k £741.42k £798.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £2.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0