BRIDGEWATER GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1169678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust provides and maintains gospel halls for the religious activities of Christians often referred to as 'Brethren'. Meetings held at these gospel halls include the Lord's Supper (Communion), Gospel preachings, Bible readings and Bible addresses. There is a structured weekly schedule of meetings which would typically be attended by 30 to 150, people depending on the type of meeting.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £19,318
Total expenditure: £19,318

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Manchester City
  • Stockport
  • Trafford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN ROBERTS Trustee 15 October 2010
None on record
HOWARD COOPER Trustee 03 March 2010
None on record
MARK ROBERTS Trustee 17 December 2009
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.29k £4.26k £3.56k £7.96k £19.32k
Total expenditure £4.29k £4.25k £3.56k £7.96k £19.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brethrens Meeting Room
289 Hale Road
Hale Barns
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 8SN
Phone:
07385391614
Website:

No information available