DUXFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise community events which encourage local residents (individuals and groups/organisations) to come together for enjoyable social events whilst at the same time fundraise for a Community Centre in the village of Duxford. The whole community is welcome to join in the events and benefit by developing friendships and community spirit within the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £15,528 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY NIELLE CLARKE | Chair | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dean Urquhart Scotson | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sijuwade Joseph Adeniran | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jane Urquhart Scotson | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JOAN CLARKE | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rose Lawrance | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Patrick Hyde | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Barker | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Dee | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hale | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Tarrant | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harold Adrian Stuart Tarrant | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.58k | £64.15k | £73.98k | £72.94k | £158.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.91k | £81.46k | £63.56k | £64.75k | £108.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.90k | £12.67k | £858 | £15.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 23 Jul 2014 as amended on 19 Dec 2019 as amended on 21 Feb 2021 as amended on 28 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; To manage and maintain the Duxford Community Centre (whether alone or in cooperation with any statutory authority or any other person or body) and to ensure its continuing viability in furtherance of the Objects TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("AREA OF BENEFIT") SHALL BE THE PARISH OF DUXFORD.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUNTS ROAD
DUXFORD
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 4RE
- Phone:
- 01223269961
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window