Trustees DUXFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1157964

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY NIELLE CLARKE | Chair | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dean Urquhart Scotson | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sijuwade Joseph Adeniran | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jane Urquhart Scotson | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JOAN CLARKE | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rose Lawrance | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Patrick Hyde | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Barker | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Dee | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hale | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Tarrant | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harold Adrian Stuart Tarrant | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.